CA AB3246 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 42703 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 21659 and 21670.1 of, to repeal Section 21660 of, and to repeal Chapter 3.7 (commencing with Section 21504) of Part 1 of Division 9 of, the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 374, 386, 2384, 2852, 5891, 6467, 6468, 6504, 6611, 8652, and 25403 of the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Sections 675.6, 9250.14, 11607, 12002, 12527, 16028, 24010, 24015, and 26103 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation: omnibus bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Assembly - AB 3246 TRANS. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FRAZIER (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3246 TRANS. (Frazier) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 3246 TRANS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5133.)
2018-05-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2018-02-22AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code42703Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code21659Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code21660Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code21670.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code2384Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code25403Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code2852Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code374Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code386Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code5891Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code6467Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code6468Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code6504Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code6611Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code8652Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code11607Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code12002Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code12527Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code16028Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code24010Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code24015Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code26103Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code675.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code9250.14Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback