CA AB3245 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 20057, 20161, 20430, 20444, 75071, 75109.1, and 75611.5 of the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public employees’ retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 3245 P.E., R. & S.S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4901.)
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-04-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
2018-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2018-02-22AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code20034Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20057Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20160Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20161Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20165New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code20430Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20444Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20636Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20636.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20638Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code20639Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21156Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21173Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21192Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21264Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21265Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21622Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21623.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code21623.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code75071Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code75109.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code75611.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback