CA AB3245 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-24 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 20057, 20161, 20430, 20444, 75071, 75109.1, and 75611.5 of the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.
Title
Public employees’ retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 3245 P.E., R. & S.S. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4901.) |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2018-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |