CA AB3238 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 18921 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalFresh.
Title
CalFresh: nonminor dependents exiting foster care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18921 | New Code | See Bill Text |