CA AB3232 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-24 - Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-24 - Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
Pending: Assembly Environmental Safety and Toxic Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 119407) to Part 15 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to washing machines.
Title
Commercial washing machines: microfiber filter.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 119407 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3232 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3232 |