CA AB3231 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 682, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1771.2 and 3073.5 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment: public works: apprenticeship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3231 GRAY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3231 Gray By Cannella (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 3231 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-22 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 682, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-22 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 16.).
2018-08-29AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 29).
2018-08-27AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6647.)
2018-08-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5512.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 27).
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2018-06-20SenateRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & I.R.
2018-06-14SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-17SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5008.)
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code1771.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code3073.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback