CA AB323 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 458, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 458, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1423, 1424, and 1424.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Long-term health facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - AB 323 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 48 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB323 Kalra et al. By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - AB 323 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB323 Kalra et al. By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - AB 323 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 12 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 458, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 13. Page 2826.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 2334.). |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 13). |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 12. Page 1430.) |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 5). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1423 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1424 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1424.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |