CA AB3224 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 179, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 179, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10503 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Public social services: county employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Assembly - AB 3224 THURMOND Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3224 Thurmond By Leyva (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - AB 3224 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3224 Thurmond By Leyva (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - AB 3224 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 179, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-08-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 6140.). |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5046.). |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 4936.) |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 24). |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10503 | New Code | See Bill Text |