CA AB3209 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 205.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property tax: exemption: principal residence: disabled veterans and their unmarried surviving spouses.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and V.A. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 205.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |