CA AB3207 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22004, 22059, 22100, 22337, 22338, 22602, 22604, and 22701 of, and to add Sections 22005.5, 22010.5, 22050.1, 22337.5, 22338.5, and 22348 to, the Financial Code, relating to finance lending.
Title
California Financing Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 3207 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 3207 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 27). |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2018-06-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 5630.) |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5363.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and B. & F. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and P. & C.P. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 14001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22005.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22010.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22050.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22059 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22337 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22337.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22338 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22338.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22348 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |