CA AB3200 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Hearing: Jun 26 @ 1:30 pm in Room 3191
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12201 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public social services: SSI/SSP.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3200 KALRA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12200.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12201Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback