CA AB32 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2290.5 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 1374.14 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 10123.855 of the Insurance Code, and to amend Section 14087.95 of, and to add Sections 14092.4, 14132.721, and 14132.722 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to telehealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telehealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 32 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-08SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-27AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-26AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-04-19AssemblyMeasure version as revised on April 15 corrected.
2021-04-15AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-02-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-02-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback