CA AB3196 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 11365) to Chapter 3.5 of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 510 of, and to add Section 511.5 to, the Labor Code, relating to business.
Title
Small business regulation: COVID-19 pandemic: employment: work hours: compensation.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and HUM. S. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11365 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 511.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3196 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3196 |