CA AB3193 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11549.3 of the Government Code, relating to information security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Information security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3193 CHAU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5510.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-12AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11549.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code12101.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback