CA AB3184 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 27, 101, 130, 144, 208, 655, 656, 683, 800, 810, 2071, 2541.2, 2541.3, 2541.6, 2545, 2546.2, 2546.9, 2550, 2550.1, 2554, 2556.1, 2556.2, 2565, 2566, 2566.1, 2567, 3004, 3010.1, 3010.5, 3020, 3021, 3023.1, 3041.2, 3041.3, 3105, 3160, 4170, and 4175 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 13401 of the Corporations Code, to amend Section 44878 of the Education Code, to amend Section 26509 of the Government Code, to amend Section 11165.5 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 14110.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to the California State Board of Optometry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California State Board of Optometry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code101Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code130Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code144Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2071Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code208Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2541.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2541.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2541.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2545Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2546.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2546.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2550Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2550.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2554Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2556.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2556.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2565Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2566Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2566.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2567Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code27Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3004Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3010.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3010.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3020Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3021Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3023.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3041.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3041.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3105Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3160Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4170Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4175Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code655Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code656Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code683Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code800Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code810Amended CodeCitation Text
Corporations Code13401Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44878Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code26509Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11165.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14110.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback