CA AB318 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 14029.93 and 14029.94 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal materials: readability.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 318 Chu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB318 Chu By Pan (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Result (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 318 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB318 Chu By Pan (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Result (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 318 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 15. Page 3122.). |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2519.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-07 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 1926.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 16). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (March 19). |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14029.93 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14029.94 | New Code | See Bill Text |