CA AB3173 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 650 to the Penal Code, relating to unmanned aircraft systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unmanned aircraft systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3173 IRWIN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-09SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5218.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code650New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback