CA AB3171 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 8260) to Division 8 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to homelessness, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Homeless Persons Services Block Grant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8260 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB3171 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB3171 |