CA AB317 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 322, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 322, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1368.5 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10125.1 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Pharmacist service coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 317 Weber Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB317 Weber (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 317 Weber Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB317 Weber (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - AB 317 Weber Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 322, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3347.). |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Ordered to the unfinished business file. |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2023-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1826.). |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 7). |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1362.) |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1368.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10125.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |