CA AB317 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 293, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 16160, 16161, 16162, 16164, 16165, and 16167 of, and to add Section 16166 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 317 PATTERSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB317 Patterson et al. By Hurtado (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 317 Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-24 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 293, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-24 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.).
2021-09-09AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2021-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-09-03SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateFrom special consent calendar.
2021-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-23SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-07-07SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2021-06-02SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2021-05-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1251.)
2021-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-08AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2021-01-27AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
2021-01-26AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback