CA AB3169 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Senate Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19851 and 19876 of, and to repeal and add Section 19854 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to gambling.
Title
Gambling Control Act: licenses.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 3169 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4887.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19854 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19876 | Amended Code | Citation Text |