CA AB3163 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1685 and 1801.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Motor Vehicles: private industry partners: electronic submission of documents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-14 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 3163 FRAZIER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-14SenateFrom committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 14)
2018-08-13SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-08-13SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2018-08-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-09SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-09SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-09SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4901.)
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code1685Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code1801.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback