CA AB3160 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-09 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-09 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65302 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 4290 of, and to add Sections 705.6 and 4290.1 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to fire safety.
Title
Fire safety.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 3160 GRAYSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 2. Page 5165.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4290 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4290.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 5818.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 705.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 8560 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 8561 | Amended Code | Citation Text |