CA AB3149 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 44303 to the Education Code, relating to substitute teachers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute teachers: Teaching Permit for Statutory Leave: expanded pathways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 3149 LIMÓN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
2018-08-09SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-09SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5438.)
2018-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23).
2018-05-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code44303New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback