CA AB3147 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 66004.1 to the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fee mitigation act: housing developments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-04-12Assembly(pending re-refer to Com. on L. GOV.)
2018-04-12AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-04-10AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code66004.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback