CA AB3143 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 653o of the Penal Code, relating to endangered wildlife.
Title
Endangered wildlife: stingrays.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 653 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3143 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3143 |