CA AB3143 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22251, 22251.2, 22251.3, 22252, 22253, 22255, 22256, 22258, and 22259 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 22250 of, to add Sections 22251.4 and 22253.5 to, and to repeal Section 22253.1.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to tax preparers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax preparers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3143 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3143 Low et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3143 B. & P. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6984.).
2018-08-29AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 29).
2018-08-28AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6729.)
2018-08-28AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5810.).
2018-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-21SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5218.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback