CA AB3143 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22251, 22251.2, 22251.3, 22252, 22253, 22255, 22256, 22258, and 22259 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 22250 of, to add Sections 22251.4 and 22253.5 to, and to repeal Section 22253.1.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to tax preparers.
Title
Tax preparers.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3143 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3143 Low et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3143 B. & P. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3143 Low et al. By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3143 B. & P. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 597, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6984.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 29). |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6729.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5810.). |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5218.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22250 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22251.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22251.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22252 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22253 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22253.1.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22255 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22256 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22258 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22259 | Amended Code | Citation Text |