CA AB3140 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6218 and 6218.01 of, and to repeal and add Section 6218.05 of, the Government Code, and to amend Sections 423.1, 423.2, 423.3, 13776, 13777.2, and 13778 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Access to reproductive health services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6218 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6218.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 6218.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13776 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13777.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13778 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 423.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 423.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 423.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3140 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3140 |