CA AB3134 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Hearing: Aug 10 @ 9:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 13286 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Refugee social services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3134 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-09SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.)
2020-06-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-04-06AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2020-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2020-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2020-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code13286New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback