CA AB3133 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 242, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 15770 of, and to add Section 15770.3 to, the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Public Works Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Assembly - AB 3133 BERMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3133 Berman By Monning (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AB 3133 BERMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 242, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-16AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6246.).
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5234.).
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-20SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2018-05-17SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-05-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5007.)
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code15770Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code15770.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code35615Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback