CA AB3124 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 22, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 35400 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: length limitations: buses: bicycle transportation devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3124 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - AB 3124 BLOOM Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 22, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-01 Approved by the Governor.
2018-05-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4221.).
2018-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 15).
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4688.)
2018-04-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9).
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code35400Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback