CA AB312 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 2.6 (commencing with Section 50480) to Part 2 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Partnership for Affordable Housing Registries in California Grant Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2024-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2023-05-18AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2023-05-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2023-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2023-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2023-02-09AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD.
2023-01-27AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
2023-01-26AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code50480New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback