CA AB3115 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1799.2 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 1797.272 of, to add Section 1797.259 to, and to add and repeal Chapter 13 (commencing with Section 1800) of Division 2.5 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to community paramedicine.
Title
Community Paramedicine or Triage to Alternate Destination Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3115 Gipson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3115 Gipson et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3115 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3115 Gipson et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3115 GIPSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Redistricting] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 6121.). |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5853.) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 5535.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25). |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 25). |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and E. & R. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1797.272 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1799.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4033 | New Code | See Bill Text |