CA AB3111 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 878 of, to add Section 871.9 to, and to repeal Section 872 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications: universal service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (April 25).
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on C. & C.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code871.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code872Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code878Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback