CA AB3107 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 65583.7 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Planning and zoning: commercial zoning: housing development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3107 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 14. Page 4778.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65583.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |