CA AB3100 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-25 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 3212.9 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.
Title
Workers’ compensation: Department of Forestry and Fire Protection: meningitis.
Sponsors
Asm. Heath Flora [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 3212.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 3600.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |