CA AB3099 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 170, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 170, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.4 (commencing with Section 11070) to Chapter 1 of Title 1 of Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to the Department of Justice.
Title
Department of Justice: law enforcement assistance with tribal issues: study.
Sponsors
Asm. James Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3099 Ramos Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB3099 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3099 Ramos Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Special Consent AB3099 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3099 Ramos Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 170, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5317.). |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4383.). |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4778.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-05-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2020-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11070 | New Code | See Bill Text |