CA AB3091 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1296, 44664, 44830.1, 44929.21, 44929.23, and 44948.3 of the Education Code, relating to school employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certificated school employees: permanent status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Assembly - AB 3091 WEBER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-11SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4828.)
2018-04-18AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-17AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17).
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback