CA AB3090 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Accountability and Administrative Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Accountability and Administrative Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14673.4 to the Government Code, relating to state property, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
State property: Department of the California Highway Patrol.
Sponsors
Asm. Todd Gloria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14673.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 33200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB3090 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB3090 |