CA AB3089 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 594, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 69519 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student financial aid: Chafee grant awards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3089 Thurmond Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3089 Thurmond et al. By Beall Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3089 Thurmond et al. By Beall Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3089 Thurmond et al. By Beall Urgency Clause (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3089 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 594, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
2018-08-31AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-31SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 6080.).
2018-08-29SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 6005.)
2018-08-29SenateRead third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 26. Noes 0. Page 6005.)
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-21SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-07-02SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5548.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code49400Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69519Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback