CA AB3088 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1792.7 and 1792.10 of, and to add Section 1792.11 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing care contracts: retirement communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 3088 CHU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3088 Chu By Monning (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 3088 CHU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Aging and Long-Term Care] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-18 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 6861.).
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5769.).
2018-08-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-21SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 1. Page 5165.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
2018-04-12AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1792.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1792.11New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1792.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback