CA AB3083 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jun 3 @ 4:00 pm in State Capitol, Assembly Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1255 of, to add Section 1256.015 to, and to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 100923) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 101 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ambulatory surgical centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-20AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-05-19AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2020-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2020-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1255Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code1256.015New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback