CA AB3081 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12940.2 to the Government Code, and to amend Section 230 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment: sexual harassment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3081 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3081 Gonzalez Fletcher et al. By Leyva (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 3081 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 7035.).
2018-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 6010.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 27).
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2018-06-20SenateReferred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & I.R.
2018-06-13SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 5627.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
2018-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 24).
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2018-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12940.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code1080New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code230Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code230.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code2810.3Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback