CA AB308 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Hearing: Mar 23 @ 1:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Title 12.7 (commencing with Section 14260) to Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to law enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement: vehicle burglary and theft task forces.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-02-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-01-26AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 25.
2021-01-25AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code14260New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback