CA AB3075 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1502, 2117, and 17702.09 of the Corporations Code, and to amend Section 1205 of, and to add Section 200.3 to, the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wages: enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3075 Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3075 Gonzalez et al. By Durazo (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 3075 Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 11.).
2020-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 3.).
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 20).
2020-08-13SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-06-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 19.)
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2020-05-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & F.
2020-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2020-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2020-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Corporations Code1502New CodeSee Bill Text
Corporations Code17702.09New CodeSee Bill Text
Corporations Code2117New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code1205Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code200.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback