CA AB3068 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 307, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 31000.6 of the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County government: contract legal counsel: auditor-controller.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3068 Daly et al. By Bates (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3068 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 307, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-07 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-29AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-23SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 5652.).
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-18SenateJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4717.)
2018-06-13SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD.
2018-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5502.)
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code26881Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code31000Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code31000.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback