CA AB3066 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 774, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 774, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18021.7 and 18502 of, and to add and repeal Part 2.2 (commencing with Section 18800) of Division 13 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to mobilehomes.
Title
Mobilehome Residency Law Protection Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] |
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3066 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3066 Mark Stone et al. By Jackson (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 3066 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3066 Mark Stone et al. By Jackson (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 3066 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 774, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6959.) |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 6007.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5043.) |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 754 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 7000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18021.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18800 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |