CA AB3061 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 104.25 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.
Title
State highways: property leases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 3061 GLORIA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3061 Gloria et al. By Hueso (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3061 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3061 Gloria et al. By Hueso (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3061 GLORIA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 442, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 7040.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 29). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6915.) |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 5955.). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 9. Page 5504.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 25). |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4613 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 104.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |