CA AB3043 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 593, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 38100, 38101, 49531, 49531.1, 49550.3, and 49590 of, and to add Section 49550.5 to, the Education Code, relating to pupil nutrition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil nutrition: breakfast and lunch programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 3043 BERMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3043 Berman By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 3043 BERMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 593, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-27SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-06-25SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-26SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-04-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4901.)
2018-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
2018-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-03AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-04-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 21).
2018-03-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-03-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2018-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback